Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Amended

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023