06/07/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/22/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/29/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |