Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note April 25, 2023
Bill April 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023

Amended

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023