05/04/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
04/27/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/27/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |