Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note January 17, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023