Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB014 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/26/2023

                    Page 1 
April 26, 2023  SB 23-014  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated January 12, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0166  
Sen. Moreno 
Rep. Lindsay  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 26, 2023 
House Public & Behavioral Health 
Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 
shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov 
Bill Topic: DISORDERED EATING PREVENTION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Disordered Eating Prevention Program and a research grant 
program within the Department of Public Health and Environment to better understand 
the risk factors, impacts, and interventions associated with disordered eating. It 
increases state expenditures beginning in FY 2023-24 and may increase state 
revenue.   
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $26,679 to the 
Department of Public Health and Environment.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill.  The bill was recommended by 
the Colorado Youth Advisory Council Committee.  
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-014 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$26,679  	$91,398 
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$5,317  	$21,932  
 	Total Expenditures 	$31,996  $113,330  
 	Total FTE 	0.2 FTE 	1.0 FTE 
Transfers  	-     	-     
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$4,002  	$13,710  
 
 
    Page 2 
April 26, 2023  SB 23-014  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Disordered Eating Prevention Program in the Department of Public Health and 
Environment (CDPHE), to be established by July 1, 2024.  The program must create a resource bank 
for research, intervention methods, treatment resources, crisis services, awareness programs, and 
educational resources regarding disordered eating prevention and care.  In collaboration with the 
Office of Suicide Prevention, the Behavioral Health Administration, the Department of Education, and 
other organizations, the program must provide support to individuals with disordered eating, 
facilitate public outreach, increase awareness regarding prevention and care, and prepare 
culturally-specific written materials for primary care offices and providers throughout the state.   
 
The bill also creates the Disordered Eating Prevention Research Grant Program to provide financial 
assistance for research related to risk factors, impacts, and root causes of disordered eating.  The grant 
program repeals July 1, 2027.  CDPHE is authorized to seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants, or 
donations from private or public sources.    
State Revenue 
The bill may increase state revenue to the General Fund from gifts, grants, or donations; however, no 
sources have been identified at this time. Gifts, grants, and donations are exempt from TABOR 
revenue limits.     
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CDPHE by approximately $32,000 and 0.2 FTE in FY 2023-24 
and $113,000 and 1.0 FTE in FY 2024-25 and ongoing from the General Fund.  Expenditures are shown 
in Table 2 and detailed below. The bill also increases workload in the Behavioral Health 
Administration and the Department of Education. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 23-014 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Public Health and Environment   
Personal Services 	$12,509  $75,048  
Operating Expenses 	- $1,350  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670 	- 
Translation Services 	$5,000  $10,000  
Printing 	$2,500  $5,000  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$5,317 $21,932  
Total Cost $31,996  $113,330  
Total FTE 0.2 FTE 1.0 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation.  Page 3 
April 26, 2023  SB 23-014  
 
 
Department of Public Health and Environment. The CDPHE will have costs to staff and implement 
the new program, as described below. 
 
 Program staff.  The CDPHE will require 1.0 FTE to create and maintain a resource bank for 
disordered eating, coordinate with other agencies, facilitate public outreach, submit reporting 
requirements, and develop guidelines for the grant program.  The fiscal note assumes an April 1 
start date for program support and reflects the General Fund pay date shift.  Additional staff may 
also be required in FY 2024-25 to administer the grant program; however, this depends on whether 
grant funding is made available, as discussed below. 
 
 Translation.  The office will translate resource bank material and other education and outreach 
materials into relevant languages for distribution to impacted communities. 
 
 Printing.  The office will print disordered eating prevention materials for primary care offices and 
patients. 
 
 Grant program.  The bill creates a grant program but does not specify funding for the program, 
which is subject to available appropriations.  If the legislature opts to make funding available, 
expenditures will increase in CDPHE for grants administration activities and grant awards.   
 
Other state agencies. The Department of Education and the Behavioral Health Administration within 
the Department of Human Services will incur workload impacts to collaborate with CDPHE, which 
can be accomplished with existing resources.  
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $26,679 to CDPHE, and 
0.2 FTE.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Education  Higher Education Human Services 
Public Health and Environment Information Technology Law 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.