Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 31, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note January 12, 2023
Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023