Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Fiscal Note January 17, 2023
Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 3, 2023

Amended

Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023