Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 15, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note January 11, 2023
Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Amended

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 30, 2023