|
06/05/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/04/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|