|
05/01/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
04/27/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
|
04/13/2023
|
First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|