Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB090 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 6, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 16, 2023

Amended

Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023