|
06/05/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/10/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
|
|
|