LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB105
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB105
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB105
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 6, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 20, 2023
Fiscal Note
February 20, 2023
Bill
January 31, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 13, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 9, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 1, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 30, 2023
Compare