Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023
Fiscal Note February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 21, 2023

Amended

Bill February 16, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023