|
04/28/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
04/25/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|