Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB170 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill March 26, 2023