|
06/02/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/10/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
|
|
|