Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Amended

Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023