05/17/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/10/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |