Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Amended

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023