05/04/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/03/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/03/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |