Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Amended

Bill April 26, 2023