LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB213
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB213
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB213
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 5, 2023
Bill
March 22, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 28, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 5, 2023
Compare