Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 11, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023