04/27/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
04/27/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/27/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |