Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB241 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Bill March 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023