House | 05/11/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |