LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB262
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB262
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB262
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 6, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 10, 2023
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 24, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 21, 2023
Compare