Senate | 05/17/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/28/2023 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2023 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |