Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 16, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note January 18, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024