05/17/2024 | Governor Vetoed | |||
05/14/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/04/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |