|
05/30/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/16/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Recalled Bill From House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|