Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note March 12, 2024
Fiscal Note February 2, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2024

Amended

Bill May 6, 2024
Bill May 4, 2024