|
06/04/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/23/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|