|
04/04/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
03/28/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|