Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 24, 2024
Fiscal Note January 17, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 12, 2024
Bill February 9, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2024

Amended

Bill March 7, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024