Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/08/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/07/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 04/20/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |