04/17/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
04/10/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |