Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1097 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 14, 2024
Fiscal Note February 2, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 4, 2024

Amended

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill March 26, 2024