04/04/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
03/28/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |