Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1103 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2024
Fiscal Note February 1, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2024

Amended

Bill March 18, 2024
Bill March 15, 2024