Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 18, 2024
Fiscal Note May 1, 2024
Fiscal Note April 12, 2024
Fiscal Note April 9, 2024
Fiscal Note February 9, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Amended

Bill May 6, 2024
Bill May 4, 2024