Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 3, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024
Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024