Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1149 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 17, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 14, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024
Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024