Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 12, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024