Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |