Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1155 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 10, 2024
Fiscal Note February 5, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2024

Amended

Bill March 13, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024