05/03/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
04/25/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |