Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024